judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00793-CR
14-89-00793-CR
08/22/1989
Burglary
Wilkerson, Anthony Dejoy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/22/1990Mandate Issued
01/22/1990Mandate Issued
01/11/1990Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
01/11/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
01/11/1990Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/21/1989Motion to withdraw appeal FILED
12/19/1989No description available.
12/15/1989Transcript FILED
08/31/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Date of Sentence
08/17/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/22/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJohn F. Carrigan
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes, Jr.
Trial Court Information
185th District Court
Harris
Honorable FRANK WILLIAM PRICE
515,871
7 years TDC