judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00401-CR
04-89-00401-CR
08/21/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Gonzalez, Juan Manuel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/1997Case Returned from Higher Court
02/11/1997Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/25/1991Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
06/18/1991Mandate received by the trial court
06/14/1991Mandate Issued
06/14/1991Mandate Issued
04/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/16/1991Submitted
04/16/1991Submission
04/16/1991Submitted
03/21/1991Submission
03/15/1991Case ready to be set
03/15/1991Brief Filed
03/15/1991Case ready to be set
03/01/1991Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/1991Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/09/1991Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1991Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/14/1990Brief Filed
11/16/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
10/17/1990Post Card Reminder No Appellant's Brief Filed
09/05/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/29/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
07/30/1990No Description Available.
07/10/1990No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
07/09/1990No Description Available.
05/22/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/21/1990No Description Available.
03/16/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990No Description Available.
01/24/1990No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990No Description Available.
12/15/1989No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
12/14/1989No Description Available.
12/08/1989No Description Available.
11/09/1989No New Event but Update in Calendar
11/02/1989Postcard Notice No Statement Of Facts Filed
09/12/1989No Description Available.
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/03/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/25/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
06/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasYvonne Salinas Gonzalez
Trial Court Information
341st Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Truman Roberts
K-89-237
99 YEARS