judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00216-CR
02-89-00216-CR
08/21/1989
All Misdemeanors
Brown, Eddy Joe
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1991Mandate Issued
08/14/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
07/10/1991Motion FiledMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
04/11/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
03/13/1991Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1991Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
01/08/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/17/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/19/1990Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/1990Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
10/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/04/1990Submitted
09/04/1990Submission
05/21/1990Brief Filed
04/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/16/1990Brief Filed
02/16/1990Order Entered
02/16/1990Submission
01/22/1990No Description Available.
01/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
01/11/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/05/1990Order EnteredAbated
12/19/1989Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
11/16/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/15/1989Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
10/17/1989Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
10/13/1989No Description Available.
09/14/1989Exhibits Filed
09/14/1989No Description Available.
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, Eddy JoeCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Honorable Tom Crum
93283-C
Jail 8 mo. & Fine $2,000.