judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00854-CR
01-89-00854-CR
08/21/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Bonner II, Feldon
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/12/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/06/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
05/08/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
05/08/1991Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
03/07/1991Case file received by higher Court or agency.
03/06/1991Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
03/04/1991Date final opinion release for publication
02/22/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
02/14/1991Motion for rehearing was not filed
01/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/24/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
07/25/1990Submission
06/20/1990Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
05/10/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
04/16/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
03/29/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Motion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
03/16/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/01/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
02/16/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/12/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/15/1989Statement of facts filed
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/16/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/11/1989Transcript filed
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Notice of appeal filed
08/16/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantStanley G. Schneider
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
512,603
life tdc