judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION v. L. T. MARSHALL

Case: B-1410
B-1410
03/06/1969
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
L. T. MARSHALL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/06/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/28/1969Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
03/24/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/20/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/07/1969Response to Motion filed
05/06/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/28/1969Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
03/24/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/20/1969Response to Petition
03/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/06/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert H. FinchAmicus Curiae
L. T. MarshallRespondent
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information