judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHANG VS. ALLSTATE RENT-A-CAR

Case Information: 36328
Short Caption:CHANG VS. ALLSTATE RENT-A-CARCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37598
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A377639Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:04/30/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gerald C. Sterns, APC--check no. 5263.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10692
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/24/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 16, 17, 18 & 19, 2000. Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 00-12781
09/25/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-16884
09/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
10/05/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-17705
10/09/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-17808
10/19/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/10/00 and 08/07/00. To Court Reporter: Janie L. Olson. 00-18566
10/25/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/10/00 and 8/7/00. Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. 00-18872
12/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The briefing schedule in this appeal is hereby suspended pending further order of this court. 00-21330
01/05/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-00305
01/17/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. fn1[in the event that appellants timely obtain proper NRCP 54(b) certification of the August 24, 2000, amended judgment and thereafter timely file an amended notice of appeal, no additional filing fees shall be required. An amended notice of appeal, if any, filed in response to this court's December 6, 2000, order to show cause shall be filed under the same docket number (No. 36328). We construe appellants' purported response to the December 6, 2000, order to show cause as a motion for extension of time. Appellants shall have an additional 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to timely demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 01-01055
01/31/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellants' Supplemental Response. 01-02039
02/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 01-02280
02/12/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Bell and Young, Ltd.--check no. 101864.
02/12/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 01-02749
02/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. to counsel for cross-appellant. Due Date: 10 days
02/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: February 15, 2001. 01-03462
03/15/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. We conclude that we now have jurisdiction over this appeal, and hereby reinstate the briefing schedule. Appellants shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1) . Pursuant to NRAP 28(h), respondent's brief shall contain the issues and argument involved in respondent's appeal as well as the answer to appellant's opening brief. 01-04584
03/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-05077
03/30/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; Supporting Declaration of Susie Injijian. 01-05556
04/02/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Respondent's Request for File a Reply to Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. 01-05605
04/09/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Respondent's Request for Leave to File a Reply; Supporting Declaration of Susie Injijian. 01-06119
04/25/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. On March 22, 2001, after having remained silent during the preceding two-and-a-half-month period in which jurisdiction over this appeal was being considered, Allstate filed a motion to dismiss this appeal for want of jurisdiction. fn5[On April 2, 2001, respondent filed a request for leave to file a reply to appellants' opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss. On April 9, 2001, appellants filed an opposition to respondent's request. We deny respondent's request as moot.] We deny Allstate's motion to dismiss this appeal. fn6[The briefing schedule set forth in this court's March 15, 2001 order remains in force and effect.] 01-06968
05/22/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 25, 2001. 01-08572
06/25/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Short Extension of Time to File Opening Brief and Appendix. Request for 7 days. 01-10707
06/26/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed June 25, 2001. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed on or before July 2, 2001. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-10727
07/02/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 07/02/01. 01-11167
07/02/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-11168
07/30/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 4, 2001. 01-12857
09/04/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant (Respondent's Answering Brief and Cross-Appeal). Mailed on: Fed Ex 09/01/01. 01-14830
09/04/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant (Respondent's Supplemental Appendix). 01-14831
10/01/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Stipulation attached). 01-16475
10/03/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 1, 2001. Appellants/cross-respondents shall have until December 3, 2001, to file a combined reply brief on appeal/answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent/cross-appellant may file a reply brief on cross-appeal within 30 days of service the the appellants/cross-respondents' reply brief. 01-16615
12/03/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Joint Reply Brief on Appeal and Answering Brief on Cross-Appeal. Mailed on: Hand delivered 12/03/01. 01-20235
12/03/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 01-20236
12/17/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 4, 2002. 01-21251
02/04/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Mailed on: 02/01/02. Signed by: David K. Rosequist. 02-02240
04/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-07606
04/30/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
07/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." - SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-11793
08/06/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11864
08/06/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 9, 2002. 02-11864