judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NATHAN L. WIMBLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0174)
Case Number:S-08-0174Case Docketed On:08/13/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:NATHAN L. WIMBLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:NATHAN L. WIMBLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNathan L. WimbleyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 72
Citation:208 P.3d 608

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/13/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/30/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/30/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/28/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
11/17/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/19/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal three volumes, Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts, Volume III, Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
01/21/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
06/02/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/18/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/22/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/19/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal