judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SONYA OWENS V. BANK OF AMERICA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1350
Short Caption:SONYA OWENS V. BANK OF AMERICA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR3797-09Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/11/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSonya Owens NPro SeN
AppelleeBank of America Corp.N
Ralph J. Dipietro NN
AppelleeBierman, Geesing, Ward LLCN
Ralph J. Dipietro NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4. (BY: ETW)
11/22/2010TMC - OTSC - motion for leave to file (LODGED) ROTSC
12/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LV TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to this Court's 11/22/10 order to show cause
12/24/2010RECEIVED - Aplt's Response to Show Cause Order
01/20/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR LEAVE to file the lodged response IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the response. It is *****MORE*****
01/20/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
01/20/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal IS DISMISSED as having been BOTH UNTIMELY FILED...and as having been TAKEN FROM A NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... SEE HARDCOPY (BRTEFA) (kt)
01/20/2011DISMISSED
01/20/2011RECEIVED- #1 (10-pgs/jeon 7/15/10 proc.)w/cd
02/11/2011MANDATE ISSUED