judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1178-89
PD-1178-89
08/22/1989
PDR Case Type
GARY, CARLTON JAMES
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/22/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/22/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateMike Guarino
Gary, Carlton JamesApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Carlton James Gary
Court of Appeals Information:
01-88-00750-CR
Aff 5-25-89
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
212th District Court
Galveston
Honorable DON G. HUMBLE
87CR0981