judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00860-CR
01-89-00860-CR
08/22/1989
Felony DWI
Pace, William Courtney
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/23/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/23/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/08/1990Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/12/1990Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
07/03/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
07/02/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
06/18/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
06/15/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/08/1990Submitted
05/08/1990Submission
05/08/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
02/08/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/08/1990Case ready to be set
02/08/1990Case ready to be set
01/15/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
12/14/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
12/14/1989Statement of facts filed
12/04/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/27/1989Brief due for retained counsel
10/12/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/27/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/15/1989Transcript filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/16/1989Notice of appeal filed
07/18/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - State of TexasBrigitte Peters
StateCriminal - AppellantDavid Cunningham
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 13
Harris
8912255
180 days & $300 fine