judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00862-CR
01-89-00862-CR
08/22/1989
Other Drug Possession
Young, Floyd
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/19/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/19/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
10/19/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/20/1989Motion to withdraw appeal
09/13/1989Supplemental transcript filed
08/30/1989Statement of facts filed
08/25/1989Transcript filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Notice of appeal filed
07/05/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. William W. Vance
StateCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
13,377-85
10 yrs tdc