judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00853-CR
01-89-00853-CR
08/22/1989
Other Drug Possession
Bonner, Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/2013Record checked in
03/01/2012Record checked out
03/01/2012Case stored
01/08/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/08/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/31/1990Motion to substitute counsel
12/15/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
11/30/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
11/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/15/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/25/1990Submitted
09/25/1990Submission
09/25/1990Submitted
07/25/1990Submission
05/25/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
05/25/1990Case ready to be set
05/25/1990Case ready to be set
04/30/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/05/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/01/1990Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
02/01/1990Statement of facts filed
01/16/1990Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
11/22/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
10/26/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
10/10/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/28/1989Brief due for retained counsel
08/22/1989Transcript filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1991RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantGeorge Steve Hebert
StateCriminal - State of TexasMichael R. Little
Trial Court Information
344th District Court
Chambers
6895
60 years