judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00240-CV
11-89-00240-CV
08/22/1989
Contract
Bandera Drilling Co., Inc.
Lavino II, E. J.; Robert W. Twiford; Robert W. Henderson; Reliance Trusts; Computech Energy & Exploration and Pyramid Drilling, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/1991Item returned to clerk's office, lawyer, etc.
01/04/1991Mandate issued
11/08/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/12/1990Submission set in Eastland
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/06/1989Brief filed
09/13/1989Brief filed
08/24/1989Filing fee paid
08/22/1989TR filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bandera Drilling Co., Inc.AppellantMarc Mcbeath
Lavino, II, E. J. Et AlAppelleeBilly W. Boone
Elizabeth Gilday
Trial Court Information
42nd District Court
Taylor
Honorable Donald Lane, Judge
39,762-A