judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00280-CR
07-89-00280-CR
08/22/1989
All Misdemeanors
Rhoades, Rose Marie
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/07/1991Mandate Issued
12/19/1990Case Returned from Higher Court
09/19/1990Case Forwarded to Higher CourtRefused
09/17/1990Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/17/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/13/1989Brief Filed
12/13/1989Case ready to be set
11/20/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/03/1989Do not use
10/03/1989Do not use
10/03/1989Do not use
09/19/1989Do not use
08/22/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/07/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Potter
Honorable Richard Dambold
52443
$400.00 Fine 90 Days Jail