judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KOSTAK VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL C/W 36678

Case Information: 36327
Short Caption:KOSTAK VS. SUNRISE HOSPITAL C/W 36678Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:36327*, 36678 Related Case(s): 36678
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A364994Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/17/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Earley Savage--check no. 16545.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10678
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Harry Paul Marquis, Chtd.--check no. 9497.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-11348
07/10/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
09/11/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate (nos. 36327/36678). 00-15959
10/16/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-18320
10/16/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statements mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant) Due Date: 15 days
11/01/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 00-19242
11/01/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 00-19243
11/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. We approve the parties' stipulation and consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. The settlement judge assigned to both matters has filed reports that the the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of these matters. This court shall forthwith conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of these appeals and cross-appeal. Appellant Joseph Kostak and cross-appellant Sunrise Hospital shall each have 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant Joseph Kostak120 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix, addressing the issues raised in both appeals. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 36327, 36678. 00-19784
11/29/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 11, 2000. To Court Reporter: Carre Lewis. Nos. 36327/36678. 00-20825
11/29/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 12 and 13, 2000. To Court Reporter: Gloria Dunn. Nos. 36327/36678. 00-20826
11/29/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 19, 2000. To Court Reporter: Kele Smith. Nos. 36327/36678. 00-20828
11/29/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: July 17, 2000. To Court Reporter: Teri Erbe. Nos. 36327/36678. 00-20830
11/30/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/19/00 and 7/17/00. To Court Reporter: Teri Erbe and Kele R. Smith (nos. 36327/36678). 00-20902
12/06/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 19, 2000. Court Reporter: Kele Smith. Nos. 36327/36678 (Filed in no. 36327) 00-21300
12/18/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 17, 2000. Court Reporter: Teri Erbe. Nos. 36327/36678 00-22017
12/29/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 11, 2000. Court Reporter: Carre Lewis. Nos. 36327/36678 (filed in 36327). 00-22691
02/16/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/12/00 and 4/13/00. Court Reporter: Gloria J. Dunn. Nos. 36327/36678 01-03053
02/27/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 02/26/01. Nos. 36327/36678. 01-03648
02/27/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Nos. 36327/36678. 01-03649
03/29/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Combined Opening Brief on Cross-Appeal and Answering Brief on Appeal. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 03/27/01. Nos. 36327/36678. 01-05485
03/29/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Appendix. Nos. 36327/36678. 01-05486
05/01/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 29, 2001. Nos. 36327/36678 01-07257
05/30/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondents Combined Answering Brief on Cross Appeal and Reply Brief on Appeal. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 5/29/01. Nos. 36324/36678 (01-09003). 01-09003
06/20/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. (Sunrise Hospital) Nos. 36327/36678. 01-10442
06/22/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The stipulation filed on June 20, 2001, is treated and granted as a joint motion for an extension of time. Respondent/cross-appellant Sunrise Hospital shall have to and including August 7, 2001, to file and serve its reply brief on cross-appeal in docket No. 36327. Nos. 36327/36678. (01-10565) 01-10565
08/02/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. (Second) Nos. 36327/36678 01-13099
08/06/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The stipulation filed on August 2, 2001, is treated and granted as a joint motion for an extension of time. Respondent/cross-appellant Sunrise Hospital shall have to and including August 15, 2001, to file and serve the reply brief on cross-appeal. Nos. 36327/36678. (01-13192) 01-13193
08/17/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondent/Cross-Appellant's Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Nos. 36327/36678. 01-14007
01/17/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 36327/36678 02-01234
01/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-01249
01/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 36327/36678. (02-01249)
02/01/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and, cause appearing, " . . . these consolidated appeals and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK. Nos. 36327/36678. 02-02132
02/01/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.