judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LYAL D. McCORMACK v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES and DIANA L. McCORMACK

Case Heading (S-08-0173)
Case Number:S-08-0173Case Docketed On:08/12/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:LYAL D. McCORMACK v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES and DIANA L. McCORMACK
Full Title:LYAL D. McCORMACK, Appellant (Respondent), v. STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY SERVICES, Appellee (Petitioner), and DIANA L. McCORMACK, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLyal D. McCormack Pro Se
AppelleeDepartment of Family Services - Child Support Enforcement DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Elizabeth Bartels Lance
AppelleeDiana L. McCormackMark L. Hughes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Jurisdiction - Appellate
Opinion Number:2008 WY 119
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/12/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/12/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/22/2008Correspondence - Incoming. Copy of letter to Judge Price from appellant with attached documents to be filed in district court.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
09/09/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/29/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/29/2008Event - Deficient pleading returned - petition for writ of certiorari returned to appellant.EventDeficient pleading returnedFinal
10/08/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/24/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal