judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JONG HOON KIM V. KIM-RAYMOND'S LIQUORS, INC.

Case Information: 10-CV-1349
Short Caption:JONG HOON KIM V. KIM-RAYMOND'S LIQUORS, INC.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7947-09Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/14/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/29/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJong Hoon Kim NPro SeN
AppelleeKim-Raymond's Liquor Store Inc.N
Bernard C. Dietz NN
Joseph T. NahYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 28, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
12/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/19/10, 5/14/10 & 8/20/10) (elp)
12/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (25-pgs/tape 2/19/10 proc.)
12/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (5-pgs/tape 5/14/10 proc.)
12/14/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (27-pgs/tape 8/20/10 proc)w/cd
12/14/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/16/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
12/21/2010RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/25/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
03/01/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/01/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/01/2011APPEARANCE- -of Joseph T. Nah on behalf of aple
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF (no oppo)
05/11/2011RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief
05/26/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION FOR LV TO FILE REPLY BRIEF and the lodged reply brief is filed. (JAC)
05/26/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/28/2011ERROR
06/29/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/2011SUBMITTED to Judges Ruiz, Thompson, King
07/22/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Ruiz and Thompson, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.)
08/29/2011FiledMandate