judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00995-CV
05-89-00995-CV
08/22/1989
Contract
Spangler, Mike
Orville D. Jones & Stephen Conner
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/14/1997Record RetentionRetain
03/28/1991Mandate Issued
03/28/1991Mandate Issued
03/12/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
10/11/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/11/1990MattConv
09/19/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/19/1990Motion to Reconsider DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/27/1990Response to Motion
08/16/1990Motion to Reconsider
08/16/1990Response to Motion
08/10/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/27/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/27/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/08/1990Exhibits Filed
05/03/1990Order Entered
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
02/23/1990MattConv
01/30/1990Submission
01/16/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1989Letter Filed
12/11/1989MattConv
09/15/1989Case ready to be set
09/15/1989Brief Filed
09/15/1989Case ready to be set
08/28/1989MattConv
08/23/1989Brief Filed
08/23/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/22/1989Transcript Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/28/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/05/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
193rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
85-14504-L