judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00202-CV
09-89-00202-CV
08/22/1989
Workers Compensation
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Samuel J. Terracina
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/04/1991Mandate Issued
12/31/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/26/1990Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
10/17/1990Petition for Writ
09/18/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/13/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/14/1990Submitted
06/14/1990Submission
03/23/1990Submission
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/23/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/23/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/22/1989Transcript Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/04/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Samuel J. TerracinaAppelleeJon B. Burmeister
National Union Fire InsuranceAppellantHoward L. Close
David R. Frohn
Trial Court Information
60th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
B-127,948