judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00282-CR
07-89-00282-CR
08/22/1989
Other Drug Sale
Adams, Matthew John
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/26/1991Mandate Issued
02/08/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/27/1990Brief Filed
04/27/1990Case ready to be set
03/29/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/28/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/02/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/01/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/06/1990Brief Filed
02/06/1990Motion to File Disp (Miscellaneous)GRANT
02/06/1990MOTION TO FILE LATE
01/12/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/08/1990Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/05/1989Do not use
10/02/1989Do not use
09/28/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
09/27/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/18/1989Do not use
08/22/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/26/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
251st District Court
Potter
Honorable Patrick A. Pirtle
27,419-C
50 Years TDC