judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00217-CR
02-89-00217-CR
08/22/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Wiggins, David Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/1991Mandate Issued
09/27/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
09/11/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
09/04/1991Motion FiledMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1991Motion Filed
05/15/1991Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
04/17/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/10/1991Response Filed
04/04/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/20/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/18/1990Letter Brief Filed
09/11/1990Submitted
09/11/1990Submission
08/06/1990Letter Brief Filed
03/23/1990Brief Filed
03/08/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/08/1990Motion Filed
03/07/1990Response Filed
02/27/1990Brief Filed
02/27/1990Motion Filed
02/27/1990Submission
02/01/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/01/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/07/1989Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
08/22/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wiggins, David LeeCriminal - Appellant
Unknown UserCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable R. E. Thornton
0345183D
Life, TDC