judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00194-CV
02-89-00194-CV
08/22/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In the Interest of Unnamed Child (Dwayne Ivy)
Edna Gladney Home
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/19/1990Mandate Issued
02/01/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/09/1990Submitted
01/09/1990Order Entered
01/09/1990Submission
12/15/1989Brief Filed
11/20/1989Brief Filed
10/20/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/22/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/1989No Description Available.
09/19/1989Motion Filed
09/15/1989Submission
09/05/1989No Description Available.
09/05/1989No Description Available.
08/31/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/22/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
08/22/1989Extension to File Bond Filed for Original Proceed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/19/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Jerry W. Woodlock
233-132231