judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00858-CR
01-89-00858-CR
08/22/1989
Felony DWI
Myers Jr., Glen Allen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/20/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/04/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
07/20/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
07/05/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
07/05/1990Opinion issuedDismissed
04/12/1990Brief due for retained counsel
02/05/1990Supplemental transcript filed
12/28/1989Motion to abate appeal disposedGrant motion
11/07/1989Motion to abate appeal
10/16/1989Transcript filed
08/22/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/17/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/17/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantBrent J. Liedtke
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 13
Harris
8914281
$300 fine & 6 months