judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00851-CV
01-89-00851-CV
08/21/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Keane, Kelly A.
Delta Lloyds Insurance Company, et.al.
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/24/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/24/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/10/1990Date final opinion release for publication
04/07/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
03/23/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
03/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/20/1990Submitted
02/20/1990Submission
02/20/1990Submitted
02/08/1990Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
02/02/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/29/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/25/1990Motion to substitute counsel
12/27/1989Supplemental transcript filed
12/21/1989Motion for oral argumentGrant motion
12/18/1989Motion for oral argument
12/12/1989Submission
11/02/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
10/20/1989Motion for leave to file strans
10/16/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/16/1989Case ready to be set
10/16/1989Case ready to be set
09/20/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
08/30/1989Filing fee paid
08/21/1989Transcript filed
08/21/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/10/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/24/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantE. Landers Vickery
StateAppelleeWilton F. Chalker
StateAppelleeRonald E. Hood
StateAppelleeGlenn J. Fahl
Trial Court Information
165th District Court
Harris
85-45849-A