judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00864-CV
01-89-00864-CV
08/24/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Michael J. Cenatiempo, Attorney Ad Litem, Dora Bredthauer
Fred Bredthauer, Jr., Amy Bredthauer, Paul Bredthauer, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/07/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/07/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
12/07/1989Opinion issuedDismissed
12/07/1989Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/16/1989Motion to stay proceedingsGrant motion
11/10/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
11/01/1989Motion to stay proceedings
10/04/1989Order entered
08/31/1989Motion for leave to file
08/28/1989Filing fee paid
08/28/1989Statement of facts filed
08/24/1989Transcript filed
08/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/22/1989Motion for leave to file
07/24/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeRoger D. Townsend
StateAppelleeLee A. Hunnell
StateAppellantMichael J. Cenatiempo
StateAppelleeJames B. Wesley
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 3
Harris
Honorable JAMES E. SCANLAN
202070