judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-00996-CR
05-89-00996-CR
08/23/1989
Robbery
Fernandez, Fernando
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/31/1993Order entered
03/31/1993Letter issued by the court
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/27/1991Mandate Issued
03/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/14/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
10/18/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
04/30/1990Brief Filed
04/30/1990Case ready to be set
04/30/1990Case ready to be set
04/19/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/28/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/27/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/02/1990Brief Filed
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Letter Sent by the Court
12/04/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/15/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/16/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/28/1989Transcript Filed
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/02/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka
F89-95865-RI
60 yrs TDC