judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00206-CR
12-89-00206-CR
08/23/1989
Burglary
Gusman, Michael
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/25/1993
11/13/1992
11/06/1992Mandate Issued
11/06/1992No Description Available.
10/21/1992Record returned.
09/23/1992Refused
05/21/1992ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
05/07/1992Motion to Extend Time to File PDRMotion or Writ Granted
05/04/1992
05/04/1992No Description Available.
04/15/1992
03/31/1992Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
03/31/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/30/1992Submitted
01/30/1992Submission
01/09/1992Submission
03/23/1990
03/22/1990Brief Filed
03/22/1990Case ready to be set
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/29/1990Brief Filed
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/27/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/27/1989No Description Available.
12/14/1989Letter from the Court
11/01/1989No Description Available.
10/16/1989
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/21/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
08/06/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/12/1993Case StoredCase stored
11/06/2017RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gusman, MichaelCriminal - AppellantMr. Clyde W. Howard III
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasHon. Howard Whitworth
Trial Court Information
145th District Court
Nacogdoches
3441-88-12
3 yrs. TDC