judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-89-00208-CV
12-89-00208-CV
08/23/1989
Contract
Jowell, Neil; Jowell, Teresa & Jowell, Trent
Seeton, Jeff Leonard and wife, Myrtle
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
11/09/1992
10/28/1992Letter from the Court
04/09/1992Mandate Issued
03/24/1992Record returned.
03/16/1992Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
02/12/1992Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
11/18/1991No Description Available.
10/18/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/18/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
06/19/1991Response to Motion Filed
06/14/1991motion for rehearing filed
05/31/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/17/1991Submitted
01/17/1991Submission
12/18/1990
12/18/1990Submission
10/23/1989
10/17/1989Brief Filed
10/17/1989Case ready to be set
09/22/1989Brief Filed
08/25/1989supplemental transcript filed
08/23/1989
08/23/1989No Description Available.
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/05/1989Surety Bond Filed
05/17/1989Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
04/28/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/18/2006Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jowell, Neil Teresa & TrentAppellantMr. John S. Ament
Seeton, Jeff Leonard & MyrtleAppelleeMr. Eldridge Moak
Trial Court Information
2nd District Court
Cherokee
Honorable Larry W Starr
88-1-9