judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8989
C-8989
08/23/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
TOM O'CONNELL MAYFLOWER INSURANCE AGENCY INC. ET AL.
THE HONORABLE JAMES R. MEYERS JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/23/1989Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/02/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/09/1990Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
09/29/1989list missing briefs when case is separated(remarksENTIRE RECORD MISSING WHEN SEPARATED
08/23/1989Brief in Support of Petition
08/23/1989Exhibits received
08/23/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
08/23/1989Motion for temporary relief
08/23/1989Motion to Stay DisposedOverruled
08/23/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/23/1989No description available.
08/23/1989Petition for writ received
08/23/1989Statement of Facts received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/09/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASRespondentMr. David A. Talbot Jr.
JORDAN GENERAL INSURANCE AGENCRelatorMr. Arthur Mitchell
DURISH, STEPHEN S.RespondentMr. Stephen L. Hubbard
NATIONAL COUNTY MUTUAL FIRE INRespondentMr. Stephen L. Hubbard
WALKER GENERAL AGENCYRespondentMr. Stephen L. Hubbard
SABINAL CLAIMS SERVICERelatorMr. Arthur Mitchell
Court of Appeals Information:
03-89-00000-CV
Overruled
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
201st District Court
Travis
Honorable James R. Meyers
453,041