judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 11th Court Of Appeals

Case: 11-89-00242-CV
11-89-00242-CV
08/23/1989
Contract
Snow, Gene M.
Jupiter Oil Co.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/03/1992Mandate issued
02/03/1992Mandate issued
10/23/1991Opinion issuedCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
04/10/1991Application for writ of error disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/1991Case forwarded to higher court
02/12/1991Application fee paid
02/12/1991Application for writ of error
02/12/1991Express fee paid
01/17/1991Mot. - For rehearing disposedOverruled
01/03/1991Mot. - For rehearing filed
12/20/1990Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
05/18/1990Supp. brief filed
04/17/1990Supp. brief filed
03/15/1990Submitted
03/15/1990Submission set in Eastland
03/02/1990Brief received
12/01/1989Supp. TR filed
11/27/1989Submission set in Eastland
11/09/1989Miscellaneous motion disposedOverruled
11/06/1989Miscellaneous motion filed
10/05/1989Brief filed
10/05/1989Case ready to be set
09/20/1989Filing fee paid
09/15/1989Filing fee not paid - possible dismissal
09/13/1989Brief filed
08/23/1989TR filed
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/03/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jupiter Oil Co.AppelleeJoseph W. Russell
Snow, Gene M.AppellantG. Dennis Sheehan
Richard K. Casner
David E. Keltner
William B. Wright Jr.
Trial Court Information
91st District Court
Eastland
32,924