judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MEDICAL SERVICES VS. GETSCHER

Case Information: 36325
Short Caption:MEDICAL SERVICES VS. GETSCHERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A372187Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Leavitt, MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Shoen, LynnSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
06/22/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Steven J. Karen--check no. 2594.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10671
06/22/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lynn R. Shoen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/07/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: June 30, 2000. 00-11617
07/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy. 00-12929
09/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On July 26, 2000, appellants Medical Services, Inc. and PVT, Inc. notified this court that they have each filed a petition for bankruptcy in the United States Bankruptcy Court. We order this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law.Medical Services, Inc. and PVT, Inc. shall have 60 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. 00-16602
11/06/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-19468
11/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
11/20/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 2, 3, and 4, 2000. To Court Reporter: Janie Olsen. 00-20350
11/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Appellant's Status Report regarding the bankruptcy proceedings. 00-20641
11/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of the Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 00-20644
11/27/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-20648
01/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for appellants Medical Services, Inc. and PVT, Inc. shall file with this court an additional status report within 90 days of the date of this order. That report, and all subsequent reports, if any, shall inform this court whether or not the bankruptcy proceeding is continuing and, in addition, shall specifically state whether or not this appeal continues to be stayed pursuant to the automatic stay mandated by 11 U.S.C. 362(a). The briefing schedule and time deadline for preparing transcripts shall remain suspended pending the lifting of the automatic bankruptcy stay. 01-00696
01/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 2, 2000 through May 4, 2000. Court Reporter: Janie L. Olsen. 01-01565
03/09/2001MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Suspending the Briefing Schedule and Time Deadline for Preparing Transcripts. 01-04291
03/15/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Respondent's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Suspending the Briefing Schedule and Time Deadline for Preparing Transcripts. 01-04598
04/17/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant's Status Report. 01-06538
04/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. fn10[Appellants Medical Services, Inc. and PVT, Inc. have filed a bankruptcy petition. On September 20, 2000, this court ordered this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. However, an appellate court may dismiss an appeal for lack of jurisdiction even where the automatic stay provisions under the bankruptcy code are otherwise applicable.] The briefing schedule and the time deadline for preparing transcripts shall remain suspended pending further order of this court shall be suspended pending further order of this court. fn11[Pending our resolution of the jurisdictional issues, we defer ruling on respondent's motion for reconsideration of our order suspending briefing and transcript preparation.] 01-07028
05/21/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 01-08424
06/28/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson.
10/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Directing Response. Appellants Medical Services, Inc. and PVT, Inc. shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response informing this court of the current status of the bankruptcy proceedings and the automatic bankruptcy stay, including whether the automatic stay is still in effect or has been lifted for purposes of dismissing this appeal pursuant to the parties' stipulation. Pending further order of this court, we defer ruling on appellant's motion to dismiss, on the jurisdictional issues, and on respondent's motion for reconsideration of our order suspending briefing and transcript preparation. 01-16643
10/19/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Response regarding Status of Bankruptcy Proceedings. 01-17683
01/04/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellants did not respond to our show cause order. Rather, appellants moved to voluntarily dismiss their appeal pursuant to the parties' stipulation. We deny appellants' motion to dismiss. Because appellants did not respond to our show cause order, and have not demonstrated that we have jurisdiction over this appeal, " . . . we dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction." fn9[We deny as moot respondent's March 9, 2001 motion for reconsideration of the order suspending the briefing and transcript preparation schedule. NNP02-MS/RR/MNB 02-00272
01/30/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00668
01/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/13/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-00668