judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM C. MOTLEY v. PLATTE COUNTY, WYOMING; PLATTE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; and STEVE KEIGLEY, SHERIFF OF PLATTE COUNTY, WYOMING, in his official capacity,

Case Heading (S-08-0171)
Case Number:S-08-0171Case Docketed On:08/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Platte CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:WILLIAM C. MOTLEY v. PLATTE COUNTY, WYOMING; PLATTE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; and STEVE KEIGLEY, SHERIFF OF PLATTE COUNTY, WYOMING, in his official capacity,
Full Title:WILLIAM C. MOTLEY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. PLATTE COUNTY, WYOMING; PLATTE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT; and STEVE KEIGLEY, SHERIFF OF PLATTE COUNTY, WYOMING, in his official capacity, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam C. MotleyH. Michael Bennett
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Platte County, WyomingRichard Rideout
AppelleePlatte County Sheriff's DepartmentRichard Rideout
AppelleeSteve KeigleyRichard Rideout
AppelleeSteve KeigleyBruce A. Salzburg
Thomas W. Rumpke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Jurisdiction - Appellate, Jurisdiction - Subject Matter
Opinion Number:2009 WY 147
Citation:220 P.3d 518

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/23/2008Brief - Appellant with statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
09/23/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant with statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/07/2008Brief - Appellee Board of County Commissioners for Platte County, Platte County Sheriff's Department, and Steve Keigley, in his official capacityBriefAppelleeFinal
11/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of Appellee (County and Sheriff's Department)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee (Sheriff)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/21/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Incoming - No designation of record - received letter from clerk of district court indicating that neither appellee filed a designation or statement that they did not need to designate further.Notice-IncomingNo designation of recordFinal
11/26/2008Order - Sanction - designation of record. Counsel for appellees, Richard Rideout and Thomas W. Rumpke.OrderSanction - designation of recordFinal
12/03/2008Fees - Sanctions received - designation - from Thomas W. RumpkeFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
12/03/2008Motion - ReconsiderationMotionReconsiderationFinal
12/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for reconsideration or rehearing on order sanctioning counsel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellees Sheriff's Department and Sheriff in official capacityNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellee Sheriff in his individual capacityNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/05/2008Motion - Other - Motion to Withdraw Petition for Reconsideration or Rehearing on Order Sanctioning CounselMotionOtherFinal
12/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Withdraw PetitionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/10/2008Event - Phone Call - Contacted Mr. Rideout's office regarding late sanction. Left message on voice mail.EventPhone CallFinal
12/11/2008Order - Other - Order granting motion to withdraw petition for reconsideration or rehearing on order sanctioning counsel.OrderOtherFinal
12/12/2008Fees - Sanctions received - designation - from Richard RideoutFeesSanctions received - designationFinal
12/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - H. Michael Bennett for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas Rumpke for Sheriff Keigley in his individual capacity; Richard Rideout for Platte County.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/19/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (H. Michael Bennett for appellant; Thomas W. Rumpke, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Richard Rideout, argument by Mr. Rumpke for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/05/2009Record - Supplemental record on appeal from district court, one volume, original papers (labeled as volume II).RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
06/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed (supplemental record labeled as volume II)Notice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/03/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing. Justice Golden writing for the court. Chief Justice Voigt files a specially concurring opinion. Justice Burke files a dissenting opinion in which Justice Kite joins.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/21/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/21/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/28/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/23/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal