judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8990
C-8990
08/23/1989
App Writ of Error
F.W. LUDEWIG AND VESTERLENE LUDEWIG
HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANY AND INTRASTATE GATHERING CORP.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/06/1989Reply to ResponseRespondentREC'D 12 COPIES OF APE BRIEF FILED IN THE APPELLATE COURT
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/12/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
01/17/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/22/1989Petitioner's reply brief
09/07/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/07/1989No description available.
09/06/1989Reply to ResponseREC'D 12 COPIES OF APE BRIEF FILED IN THE APPELLATE COURT
08/23/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/12/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-87-00522-CV
Rev/Ren/Aff As Modified
773 SW2d 610, 05-25-89
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable J. BONNER DORSEY
Trial Court Information
156th District Court
Live Oak
Honorable W. Rachel Littlejohn
6514-B