judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00195-CV
02-89-00195-CV
08/23/1989
Contract
Waggoner III, Travis and Wanda R. Waggoner
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/17/1991Order Entered
10/11/1991Letter to Attys to Pickup Exhibits-Mandate Issued
10/11/1991Mandate Issued
09/05/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/18/1991Writ Filed
06/25/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/13/1991Response Filed
06/03/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/21/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1990Submitted
02/21/1990Submission
12/01/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/25/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989Exhibits Filed
09/26/1989No Description Available.
09/26/1989Submission
09/18/1989No Description Available.
09/18/1989No Description Available.
08/23/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Farm Fire & Casualty Co.Appellee
Waggoner III, TravisAppellant
Waggoner, Wanda R.Appellant
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clyde R. Ashworth
17-103951-87