judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00205-CR
09-89-00205-CR
08/24/1989
Burglary
Allen, Jr., Paul M.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1990Mandate Issued
10/31/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/03/1990Petition for ReviewRefused
07/30/1990Petition for ReviewFiled in Higher Court
07/26/1990Petition for Review
07/25/1990Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Denied
07/24/1990Miscellaneous Motions
06/13/1990Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/1990Mt to Withdraw as attorney disposedMotion or Writ No Action Taken
05/17/1990Mt to Withdraw as attorney filed
05/02/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/05/1990Brief Filed
04/05/1990Case ready to be set
03/26/1990Brief Filed
03/14/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/02/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/04/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/29/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/06/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/16/1989Transcript Filed
08/24/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
45590
life - TDC, $10,000 fine