judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-89-00203-CV
09-89-00203-CV
08/23/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Jerry Landrum, Individually and dba Drilco, Inc.
Hale-Mills Construction, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/1990Mandate Issued
05/16/1990Order EnteredDismissed
05/11/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/18/1990ResponseMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1990Response
04/11/1990Mot to Consolidate Cases DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/05/1990Miscellaneous Motions
03/23/1990Submission
11/16/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Case ready to be set
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/22/1989Brief Filed
08/23/1989Transcript Filed
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/02/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerry LandrumAppellantRussell W. Heald
Hale-mills Const., Inc.AppelleeJohn W. Newton III
Trial Court Information
136th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Jack R. King
D-126,879-A