judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8991
C-8991
08/24/1989
Direct Appeal
CHARLES L. MEYER
THE STATE BAR OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/21/1990Notice of Appeal filedAppellant in caseTO U.S.S.C.
02/05/1990Notice of Appeal filedTO U.S.S.C.
11/08/1989Motion for RehearingAppellant in case
10/04/1989Appellees' Brief filedAppellee in case
08/24/1989Direct Appeal filedAppellant in caseTRANSCRIPT
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/04/1990Notice of Appeal from the U. S. Supreme Courtstating that petition for rehearing is denied 8-30-90
07/03/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeWRIT OF CERT DENIED 06-28-90.
05/23/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeWRIT OF CERT FILED 4/5/90.
03/16/1990U.S. Supreme Court noticeLETTER FROM CLERK US SUPREME COURT, M/E/T TO FILE CERTIORARI, GRANTED, EXTENDED TO APRIL 5, 1990.
02/21/1990Notice of Appeal filedTO U.S.S.C.
02/05/1990Notice of Appeal filedTO U.S.S.C.
01/12/1990Mandate issuedREHEARING OVERRULED.
12/06/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
12/06/1989Motion to Amend disposeddismissed as moot
11/16/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
11/15/1989Motion to Amend Filed2ND 2D M/L TO AMEND PLEADING
11/08/1989Motion for Rehearing
11/01/1989cover ltr with jmt
11/01/1989Direct Appeal disposedDismissed for Want of JurisdictionM/L TO AMEND PLEADING DISMISS/MOOT
11/01/1989Motion to Amend disposeddismissed as mootM/L TO AMEND PLEADING
10/04/1989Appellees' Brief filed
09/22/1989Motion to Amend FiledM/L/ TO AMEND PLEADING
09/14/1989Letter FiledIN REFERENCE TO BRIEF FILED ON 09-11 -89, WRONG SEQUENCE OF PAGES.
09/11/1989Brief of appellants filed
08/24/1989Direct Appeal filedTRANSCRIPT
08/24/1989Letter FiledDIRECTING 3RD TO FILE DIRECTLY WITH SUPREME COURT
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
01/12/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
345th District Court
Travis
Honorable Jerry A. Dellana
453,046