judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals

Case: 03-89-00185-CR
03-89-00185-CR
08/24/1989
Habeas Corpus
Ex Parte: Herbert E. Hargett
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/2015Record checked in
01/07/2015Record checked out
04/05/1995CASE STORED
01/26/1993Mandate Issued
10/20/1992Case returned from higher court
09/23/1992Petition for discretionary review refused
06/08/1992Case forwarded to higher court
06/01/1992Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
04/01/1992Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/22/1992Case ready to be set
01/22/1992Supplemental Brief Filed
01/07/1992Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/03/1992Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
12/16/1991Case returned from higher court
12/16/1991Case ready to be set
11/20/1991Case remanded from higher court
11/20/1991Case remanded from higher court
09/12/1990Petition for discretionary review granted
08/02/1990Case forwarded to higher court
07/13/1990Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
06/13/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/24/1990Motion for rehearing filed
05/09/1990Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
05/09/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
02/28/1990Submission
02/07/1990Brief filed
02/07/1990Case ready to be set
02/06/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/24/1990Brief filed
01/24/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1990Brief received, not filed
01/12/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/20/1989Order Entered
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/25/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/16/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/24/1989Transcript Filed
08/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/26/1993Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hargett, Herbert E.AppellantMr. Walter C. Prentice
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMr. Sean K. Proctor
Trial Court Information
27th District Court
Bell
Honorable Jack W Prescott
28,341-B