judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-89-00414-CV
04-89-00414-CV
08/24/1989
Summary Judgment
Jose Montez & Gregory Canfield
Bexar County Hospital District & Alex Flores
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/08/1991Mandate Issued
03/08/1991Mandate Issued
03/04/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
01/23/1991Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
11/01/1990Information regarding cause received
10/18/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/17/1990Writ of Error filed
09/17/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/03/1990Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1990Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1990Mot. EOT to file ___________ DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/03/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1990Motion EOT to file Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/17/1990Mot. EOT to file ____________ Filed
07/16/1990Brief Filed
07/16/1990Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
07/16/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/16/1990Rehearing Received
06/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Submitted
02/13/1990Submission
02/13/1990Submitted
02/09/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/05/1990Submission
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
10/20/1989Requests Oral Argument
10/20/1989Brief Filed
10/20/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Requests Oral Argument
09/25/1989Brief Filed
08/24/1989No Description Available.
08/24/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/08/1989Appeal Bond Filed
07/13/1989Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
131st Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Raul Rivera
87-CI-15258
n/a