judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

SIEGFREID SCHLUSSELBERG, ET AL. v. ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS

Case: B-1415
B-1415
03/07/1969
Application for Writ of Error
SIEGFREID SCHLUSSELBERG, ET AL.
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS OF THE STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/28/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/20/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/16/1969Opinion issued
05/07/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/28/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/20/1969Response to Petition
03/07/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/07/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts of the State of TexasRespondent
Siegfreid Schlusselberg, et al.Petitioner
Henrichson and BatesAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information