judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY POLLOCK V. MARTHA M. MUSE

Case Information: 10-CV-1348
Short Caption:ANTHONY POLLOCK V. MARTHA M. MUSEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAV1292-09Filed Date:10/27/2010

Opening Event Date:10/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/29/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony Pollock N
Charles C. ParsonsYN
AppelleeMartha M. Muse N
Walter E. GillcristYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/16/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 4/23/10, 4/26/10, 4/27/10. 4/28/10, 4/29/10 & 4/30/10) (elp)
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 27, 2010, and the statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and transcripts in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (38-pgs/maddox 4/23/10 proc.)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (213-pgs/van bremen 4/26/10 proc.)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (215-pgs/van bremen 4/27/10 proc.)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (36-pgs/van bremen 4/28/10 proc.)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (14-pgs/van bremen 4/29/10 proc.)
03/17/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#6 (31-pgs/van bremen 4/30/10 proc.) w/cd
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/18/2011RECORD INDEX
03/21/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/27/11
04/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 27, 2011, and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (JAC) elp
05/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/10/11
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 10, 2011 and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 11, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
06/10/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 6/21/11
06/15/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief & appendix I thru III
06/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, and the lodged brief and appendix Volumes 1-3, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellant and appendix Volume 1-3 are filed. It is (MORE)
06/16/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/16/2011APPENDIX - Volume 1-3
06/16/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed on or before July 21, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
07/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) 7/25/11Granted
07/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) 7/25/11
07/29/2011FiledApppellee's brief (Appellee)
07/29/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/15/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
09/19/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Vacating 7/29/11, Order to the extent it filed appellee's supplemental appendix
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/02/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/07/2012FiledArgued before Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Reid Charles C. Parsons, Esq. for appellant Walter E. Gillcrist, Jr., Esq. for appellee
03/14/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge)
04/06/2012FiledMandate
04/12/2012FiledMotion To Publish (Appellee)Denied
04/25/2012FiledOrder Denying aple's motion to publish.
04/23/2014FiledArchived