judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TRUCK INN, INC. VS. AFFORDABLE FUEL & OIL CO.

Case Information: 36326
Short Caption:TRUCK INN, INC. VS. AFFORDABLE FUEL & OIL CO.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36664
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9701414AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / King, PatrickSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Kevin J. Mirch, Ltd.--check no. 2076.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10675
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
06/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Estimate of Cost of Transcript from Sunshine Reporting Services. 00-11014
08/08/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/25/00. Court Reporter: Corrie Wolden. 00-13720
08/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 22, 2000. Court Reporter: Deborah Middleton Greco. 00-15351
08/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 23, 2000. Court Reporter: Stephanie Zolkowski. 00-15352
09/14/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 24, 2000. Court Reporter: Gail West-Willsey. 00-16287
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 36326 and 36664. 00-16650
11/20/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. (Nos. 36326 and 36664). 00-20364
11/20/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. (Nos. 36326 and 36664). 00-20365
11/20/2000Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. (Nos. 36326 and 36664). 00-20366
12/07/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in these matters and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . these appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. fn1[Appellants' motion to consolidate these appeals filed on September 20, 2000, is denied as moot.] Nos. 36326, 36664. NNP/CLK 00-21404
12/07/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.