judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: C-8993
C-8993
08/24/1989
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
RUSSELL CHAMBERS AND CTRIG INC.
THE HONORABLE JERRY DELLANA JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/08/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/01/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/16/1989Case StoredNO REHEARING FILED
10/25/1989M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruledW/MO TO EXPEDITE GRANTED.
10/25/1989Motion to Expedite disposedFiling granted
09/28/1989Motion to ExpediteON BEHALF OF RONALD ROSENBERG
09/28/1989No description available.
09/28/1989Statement of Facts receivedRECEIVED 12 COPIES
09/19/1989Letter FiledREQUEST FOR DELAY UNTIL 9-25-89 SO THAT TRANSCRIPT CAN BE FILED
09/08/1989Reply to Response
08/24/1989Exhibits receivedINCORPORTED WITH ORIGINAL PETITION
08/24/1989Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
08/24/1989Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/16/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
RONALD ROSENBERGRespondentMr. J. Scott Bardole
Court of Appeals Information:
03-89-00000-CV
Denied
3rd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
201st District Court
Travis
Honorable Jerry A. Dellana
443,045