judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00863-CV
01-89-00863-CV
08/23/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
James, John E.
Kapusta Interest
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/18/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/06/2000Date Petition for Review is due in Supreme Court
07/07/2000Motion for Rehearing Due
06/22/2000Opinion issuedDismissed
06/22/2000Opinion issuedDismissed
06/21/2000Submitted
06/21/2000Submission
06/21/2000Submitted
06/10/2000Response due to a motion or Court's Order.
05/11/2000Case reinstated
05/11/2000Order enteredReinstate case after abatement
05/11/2000Case reinstated
06/08/1999Proceeding stayed (11 U.S.C. 362) & suspended (Tex. R. App. P. 8.2.) as of date petition filed in bankruptcy court
01/25/1990Order enteredStay case
01/25/1990Order enteredStay case
01/02/1990Motion to stay appeal filed
11/03/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/03/1989Case ready to be set
10/12/1989Filing fee paid
10/12/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
10/12/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/09/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/02/1989Motion for leave to file strans
09/18/1989Filing fee paid
09/07/1989Motion to ext. time to file bond disposedGrant motion
09/07/1989Transcript filed
08/23/1989Motion to extend time to file bond
08/23/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
REPORTER, COURTCourt reporterCarol Castillo
INTEREST, KAPUSTAAppelleeJeffrey R. Singer
Bennett G. Fisher
JUDGE, TRIALTrial court judgeHon. Kent C. Sullivan
JAMES, JOHN E.AppellantStephen D. Statham
COORDINATOR, TRIAL COURTTrial court coordinatorLara Fauntleroy
District Clerk, District District clerkCharles Bacarisse
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM T. POWELL
88-09437