judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00893-CV
01-89-00893-CV
09/01/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
King, Gloria
Canter, Roger Ind./Executor of Estate Eloise Canter Waters
No
8th Court of Appeals
02/26/1990
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/26/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals
02/26/1990Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
02/01/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
01/04/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/07/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/25/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
10/23/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/25/1989Filing fee paid
09/22/1989Statement of facts filed
09/22/1989Transcript filed
09/01/1989Notice of appeal filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/30/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/26/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantHon. Gary L. Britt
StateAppelleeMichael J. Cenatiempo
StateAppellantHon. Bernard L. Hebinck
StateAppelleeSharon B. Gardner
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 2
Harris