judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1216-89
PD-1216-89
09/05/1989
PDR Case Type
ANDREWS, BRENDA GAIL (PERRY)
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/06/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/05/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Andrews, Brenda Gail (Perry)Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Mr. Leslie B. Vance
STATE OF TEXASStateEmory C. Walton
Court of Appeals Information:
11-87-00192-CR
Aff 7-20-89
11th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
91st District Court
Eastland
Honorable Herman Fitts
17,184