judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01043-CV
05-89-01043-CV
09/01/1989
Juvenile
Turner, Reginald
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/13/1997Record RetentionRetain
12/07/1990Mandate Issued
12/07/1990Mandate Issued
09/28/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/10/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/06/1990Motion for Leave to File
08/02/1990Response to Motion
07/25/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/25/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/25/1990Order Entered
05/24/1990Motion for Postponement
05/24/1990Submission
05/24/1990Submitted
05/24/1990Submission
05/24/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Letter Filed
05/21/1990Motion for Oral Argument DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/1990Motion for Oral Argument
05/01/1990Motion to Reconsider DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/26/1990MattConv
04/09/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
04/04/1990Motion to Reconsider
03/30/1990Case ready to be set
03/30/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Denied
03/30/1990Case ready to be set
03/23/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/15/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/16/1990Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/19/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/04/1989Motion for Leave to File
11/30/1989Response to Motion
11/22/1989Letter Sent by the Court
11/06/1989Brief Filed
11/06/1989Motion for Leave to File
11/01/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/09/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/09/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/03/1989Electronic Tapes Filed/Statement of Facts
09/28/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/1989Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Denied
09/15/1989Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
09/15/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/01/1989Transcript Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/15/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/17/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
305th Judicial District Court
Dallas
JD 22179-X