judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00213-CV
02-89-00213-CV
09/01/1989
Injunction
The City of Grapevine, A Municipal Corporation
Grapevine Pool Road Joint Venture
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/12/1991Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1991Letter to Attys to Pickup Exhibits-Mandate Issued
04/16/1991Mandate Issued
02/27/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
05/15/1990Letter Brief Filed
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/09/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/06/1990Response Filed
04/05/1990Order Entered
04/02/1990Motion Filed
03/30/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
12/26/1989Brief Filed
12/20/1989Other Document Filed
12/01/1989Brief Filed
11/29/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/29/1989No Description Available.
11/27/1989Response Filed
11/17/1989Motion Filed
11/03/1989Submission
11/01/1989Exhibits Filed
11/01/1989No Description Available.
10/05/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/05/1989Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/28/1989Response Filed
09/21/1989Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/18/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/18/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/15/1989No Description Available.
09/14/1989No Description Available.
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The City Of Grapevine, A MunicAppellant
Grapevine Pool Road Jt VentureAppellee
The City Of GrapevineAppellant
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Fred W. Davis
17-107621-87