judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-89-00214-CV
02-89-00214-CV
09/01/1989
Contract
Mid-States Services, Inc. and Sheriff Don Carpenter
Tarrant County, TX, Roy English, O.L. Watson, & Bob Hampton
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/05/1991Mandate Issued
06/19/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/19/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/18/1991Writ Filed
04/18/1991Writ Filed
03/19/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/19/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/11/1991Response Filed
02/28/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/28/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/13/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed in Part and Reversed & Rendered in Part
04/24/1990Submitted
04/24/1990Submission
04/11/1990Brief Filed
03/22/1990Letter
03/21/1990Brief Filed
03/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/15/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
02/02/1990Motion for Continuance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/1990Response Filed
01/22/1990Brief Filed
01/22/1990Motion for Continuance Filed
01/15/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/1990Brief Filed
01/12/1990Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/13/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/12/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
11/10/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/09/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/16/1989Exhibits Filed
10/16/1989No Description Available.
10/02/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/29/1989No Description Available.
09/27/1989No Description Available.
09/27/1989Submission
09/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Carpenter, DonAppellant
English, RoyAppellee
Mid-states Service, Inc.Appellant
Watson, O.l.Appellee
Hampton, BobAppellee
Tarrant County, TexasAppellee
Trial Court Information
17th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Franklin J. Douthitt
17-112651-88