judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-89-00819-CR
14-89-00819-CR
09/01/1989
Other Felony
Tatum, Arthur
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/10/1990Case stored
07/31/1990Mandate Issued
07/31/1990Mandate Issued
07/16/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
06/29/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
06/14/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS REFORMED
06/14/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED AS REFORMED
06/08/1990No description available.
05/31/1990Order Entered
05/22/1990Submitted
05/22/1990Submission
05/22/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
04/24/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/24/1990Case ready to be set
04/24/1990Case ready to be set
03/22/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/13/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/15/1990Ext.time file Supp.State.FactsDISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
02/15/1990No description available.
02/06/1990Ext.time to file supp.statement of facts FILED
02/06/1990No description available.
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/18/1990Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
01/11/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/29/1989No description available.
12/28/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STADENIED
12/18/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/18/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
11/24/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/15/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts RECEIVED-ANT,APE
11/14/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/16/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
10/12/1989Transcript FILED
09/01/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/21/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
08/15/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasHon. Mark W. Patterson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasDavid P. Weeks
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJohn E. Wright
Trial Court Information
12th District Court
Walker
Honorable ALLEN L. STILLEY
14,866
15 years TDC